MD HB1021 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from one to three the number of students authorized to work under the supervision of a master barber.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251
2019-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback