MD HB1020 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, under certain circumstances, to establish a certain Health Services Initiative; requiring the Health Services Initiative to apply to certain individuals, require certain schools to provide certain services, offer services from certain providers, and require the Department to reimburse certain providers in a certain manner for certain services; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Services Initiative - Vision Care for Low-Income Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseUnfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
2020-02-25HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB940 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Hearing canceled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General15150(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback