MD HB1019 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to adopt regulations requiring electric companies and electric cooperatives to adopt a method for an electricity supplier enrolling a certain customer to provide certain information to adequately identify the customer without using the customer's account number; requiring the regulations to require that a certain customer enrolling with an electricity supplier may offer certain information as proof of identity under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Commission - Electric Companies and Electric Cooperatives - Customer Identification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2020-02-19HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB529 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities7311(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback