MD HB1018 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 27 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the administrative and operational expense cap of the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System and the State Retirement Agency for fiscal years 2019 through 2022 under certain circumstances; altering the basis for the calculation of the administrative and operational expense cap; applying the Act; and making certain sections of the Act contingent on the taking effect of another Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and Calculation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (134-4)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback