MD HB1017 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 405
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the required contents of the label with which cottage food products must be prepackaged to allow the inclusion of the phone number of the cottage food business and a certain identification number, rather than the address of the cottage food business; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to provide a certain identification number to a cottage food business on request for a certain purpose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Cottage Food Product Labels - Identification Number

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 405
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-14SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General21330.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback