MD HB1016 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Calvert County, for the 2020-2021 licensing period, to reimburse holders of certain alcoholic beverages licenses the entire amount of the annual license fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-12SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-08SenateMotion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
2021-04-08SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-24SenateHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-17SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2021-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2021-02-05HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback