MD HB1016 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the purpose and authorized uses of the Maryland Corps Program Fund to include covering expenses incurred to study certain matters and providing funding to match certain gifts or grants; requiring, in fiscal year 2021 and each fiscal year thereafter, funds for the Maryland Corps Program to be as provided in the State budget to cover certain additional expenses; and requiring, for fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $150,000 to the

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB845 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education241108(n/a)See Bill Text
Education241109(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback