MD HB1013 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 404
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a vehicle lessor from renting a vehicle to another person unless the lessor verifies that the person's driver's license is not expired; authorizing a vehicle lessor to meet certain inspection and verification requirements related to the driver's license of a vehicle lessee through electronic or digital means; authorizing a vehicle lessor to keep certain records in an electronic or digital format; requiring a vehicle lessor to delete certain personal data within 60 days after participation in a certain agreement is terminated; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicles - Driver's License Verification and Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 404
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-17SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {520515/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB898 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Referred Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation18103(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback