MD HB1011 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, except for regulations issued by the Department of the Environment, no provision of the State building code or other law or regulation may prohibit or otherwise limit the use of a refrigerant if the refrigerant is designated as acceptable for use under federal listing requirements and any appliance containing the refrigerant meets federal safety standards and use conditions.
Title
Public Safety – Refrigerants – Limitations on Use
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722 |
2023-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783425/1 Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB741 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 723
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 12 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |