MD HB1011 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the termination date of certain provisions of the Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program; altering the title of the Program; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $100,000 for the Program in fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Higher Education Outreach and College Access Pilot Program – Alterations (Maryland College Access Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {524261/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2015(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2018(n/a)See Bill Text
Education111101(n/a)See Bill Text
Education111102(n/a)See Bill Text
Education111103(n/a)See Bill Text
Education111104(n/a)See Bill Text
Education111105(n/a)See Bill Text
Education111106(n/a)See Bill Text
Education111107(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback