MD HB1009 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-15)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Workgroup on the Licensing of Food Service Facilities; requiring the Workgroup to study, evaluate, and make recommendations on whether certain entities should be exempt from obtaining a food service license, special circumstances warrant certain exemptions, and food service facility laws may be simplified or clarified; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings by December 31, 2018, to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workgroup on the Licensing of Food Service Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90
2018-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {116184/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback