MD HB1008 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain registered cardiovascular invasive specialists to perform certain functions; requiring a registered cardiovascular invasive specialist to be supervised by a licensed physician; establishing that the failure of certain licensed physicians to provide proper supervision constitutes professional misconduct; requiring the State Board of Physicians to keep a list of all cardiovascular invasive specialists and adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular Professionals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Diseases
Health Occupations
Laboratories
Patients
Physicians
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Diseases
Health Occupations
Laboratories
Patients
Physicians
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Safety