MD HB1007 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to ensure that every child in the State has access to a child advocacy center; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to contract with an organization that meets certain requirements to establish a Maryland Statewide Organization for Child Advocacy Centers; requiring the money for child advocacy centers to be distributed in a certain manner and to be used to supplement, not supplant, funds for the program from other sources; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Advocacy Centers - Expansion

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50
2019-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
2019-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {438579/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {994964/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1007&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1007f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1007t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb1007e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_50_hb1007e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1007_99496401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/hb1007_43857901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/hb1007.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1007_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0627.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb1007_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1113.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1351.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback