MD HB1007 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the fee which a homeowners association may impose for a certain inspection from $50 to $100; establishing that a homeowners association shall be composed of all lot owners and that the bylaws may authorize the delegation of any power of the homeowners association; establishing certain powers of the board of directors of a homeowners association; requiring certain notice of certain meetings be provided to members of a homeowners association a certain period of time before the meeting and in a certain manner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and Rules

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-19HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseReassigned to Environment and Transportation
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback