MD HB1006 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each State mental health facility to establish a staffing committee to create a staffing plan for nurses working in the State facility; providing for the membership of a staffing committee; providing for the contents of a staffing plan; requiring a staffing committee to convene by November 30, 2019 and at least once during each 3-month period thereafter for a certain purpose; requiring a State facility to submit a certain staffing plan to the Maryland Department of Health; etc.
Title
State Mental Health Facilities - Staffing Committee and Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2019-03-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Data
Drugs
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Patients
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Records
Reports
State Hospitals
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Data
Drugs
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Patients
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Health
Records
Reports
State Hospitals
Time
Work, Labor and Employment