MD HB1003 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Transferring the administration and management of the Telecommunications Access of Maryland and Telecommunications Devices and Distribution of Accessible Information for Disabled Individuals programs from the Department of Information Technology to the Department of Disabilities; requiring the Department of Disabilities to provide staff, including a director, to the Governor's Advisory Board for Telecommunications Relay; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Services - Department of Disabilities - Accessibility Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-14HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB851 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Human Services7114(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7120(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7801(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7802(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7803(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7804(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7805(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7806(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7901(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7902(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7903(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7904(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7905(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7906(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A501(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A502(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A503(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A504(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A505(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A506(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A601(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A602(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A603(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A604(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A605(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement3A606(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback