MD HB1003 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a single individual to hold certain retail alcoholic beverages licenses that are issued by different local licensing boards for restaurants, hotels, or motels; specifying that the number of licenses a single individual may hold is limited only by the cap imposed by each local licensing board on the licenses that the local licensing board issues; and authorizing that the licenses may be issued for the use of certain persons.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Issued by Different Local Licensing Boards to Single License Holder - Authorized
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-0) (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-0) (Y: 124 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 225 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-1) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-0) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Corporations
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Restaurants
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Corporations
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Restaurants