MD HB1002 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the title of the Executive Director of the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to be the Chief Executive Officer; making conforming changes; and authorizing the publisher of the Annotated Code of Maryland to make certain changes in a certain manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Chief Executive Officer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {705964/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB308 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-27 - Hearing canceled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development10402(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10404(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10405(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development10448(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development5203(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development6606(n/a)See Bill Text
Education12305(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government92204(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government92901(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback