MD HB1002 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to form a workgroup with representatives of county oyster committees to examine issues related to the composition and duties of county oyster committees; and requiring the workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015.
Title
Natural Resources - County Oyster Committees
Sponsors
Del. Jay Jacobs [R] | Del. Christopher Adams [R] | Del. Carl Anderton [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] |
Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Del. Jeff Ghrist [R] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {800415/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Counties
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Reports
Revenue and Taxes