MD HB1000 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a public library from charging a fine for overdue library materials on a minor's library materials; prohibiting a public library from charging a replacement fee for a minor's overdue library materials until 21 days after the date the materials were due; requiring a public library to cancel a fee if a minor's overdue materials are returned; requiring the Governor to include $7,500,000 in fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter in the annual operating or capital budget for county library capital projects; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Building Lifelong Library Learners Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-16HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (37-8)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-10SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
2020-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed (117-16)
2020-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {215668/1 Adopted
2020-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB524 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education23205(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23409(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23503(n/a)See Bill Text
Education23509(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback