MD HB1000 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-26 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-26 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the sale, rental, or transfer of a regulated firearm, rifle, or shotgun to a person who is on the Terrorist Watchlist maintained by the Federal Bureau of Investigation; and prohibiting the Secretary of State Police from issuing a permit to carry, wear, or transport a handgun to a person listed on the Terrorist Watchlist.
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - Terrorist Watchlist
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |