MD HB100 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing, from 29 to 30, the number of members of the Maryland Agricultural Commission appointed by the Governor; and requiring the Governor to appoint a member from a list of at least two nominees representing the hemp industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Agricultural Commission - Hemp Industry Member

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-10SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-28SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-02-25HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-24HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-21HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Agriculture2203(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback