MD HB100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - (Senators Griffith, Zucker and Serafini)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Making the proposed appropriations contained in the State Budget for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020, in accordance with Article III, Section 52 of the Maryland Constitution; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {613121/2 (Senator Ellis) Rejected (6-40) (Y: 7 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-14) (Y: 125 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Committee Amendment (#12) Adopted (96-40) (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Committee Amendment (#48) Adopted (101-35) (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Committee Amendment (#26) Adopted (95-42) (Y: 96 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Committee Amendment (#105) Adopted (98-40) (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Committee Amendment (#143) Adopted (98-40) (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {683921/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (42-92) (Y: 43 N: 93 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {143728/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (42-96) (Y: 43 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {433923/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (43-96) (Y: 44 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22Senate(Senators Griffith, Zucker and Serafini)
2019-03-22SenateSenate advisors:
2019-03-22SenateSenators King, Ferguson, Guzzone, Peters, and Edwards
2019-03-22SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-03-22SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2019-03-22House(Delegates Haynes, Reznik and Korman)
2019-03-22HouseHouse advisors:
2019-03-22HouseDelegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, B. Barnes, and Beitzel
2019-03-22HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-03-22HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-03-22HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-03-21SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2019-03-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-20SenateFloor Amendment {613121/2 (Senator Ellis) Rejected (6-40)
2019-03-20SenateFloor Amendment {673524/1 (Senator Kagan) Withdrawn
2019-03-20SenateFloor Amendment {513727/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFloor Amendment {533026/1 (Senator Kagan) Withdrawn
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#95-103) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#88-94) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#75-87) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#52-74) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#41-51) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#30-40) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#22-29) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#12-21) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Amendment (#1-11) Adopted
2019-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments
2019-03-19SenateSpecial Order until 3/20 (Senator King) Adopted
2019-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateLaid Over (Senator King) Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (124-14)
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {683921/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (42-92)
2019-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {143728/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (42-96)
2019-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {433923/1 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (43-96)
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#180-188) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#151-179) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#144-150) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#143) Adopted (98-40)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#142) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#142-150)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#124-141) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#108-123) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#106-107) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#105) Adopted (98-40)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#91-104) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#91-107)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#73-90) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#53-72) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#49-52) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#48) Adopted (101-35)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#34-47) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#34-52)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#27-33) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#26) Adopted (95-42)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#18-25) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#18-33)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#13-17) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#12) Adopted (96-40)
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#7-11) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#6) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#1-5) Adopted
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Amendment (#1-17)
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments
2019-03-11HouseSpecial Order until 03/13 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0100&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0100f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0100t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0100_14372801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0100_43392301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0100_68392101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0100_51372701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0100_53302601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0100_61312102.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0100_67352401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-operating-house-appropriations-report.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-operating-house-reprint-budget-bill.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-operating-house-summary.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0100_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0406.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0407.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0408.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0409.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0410.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0411.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0412.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0413.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-operating-senate-budget-taxation-report.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-operating-senate-reprint-budget-bill.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/Pubs/BudgetFiscal/2019rs-budget-docs-operating-senate-summary.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0100_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0455.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0699.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0726.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback