MD HB100 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax under specified circumstances for specified retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a law enforcement officer or the individual's service as fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; defining "emergency services personnel" as emergency medical technicians or paramedics; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154
2017-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2017-03-21SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-24SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2017-02-23HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2017-02-21HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-02-17HouseSpecial Order until 2/21 (Delegate Clark) Adopted
2017-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {295569/1 Report Adopted
2017-02-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2017-02-01HouseHearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
2017-01-16HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0100&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0100f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0100t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_154_hb0100t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0100_29556901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0100.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0100_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0100_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0100,h-0157&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0100,s-1026&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback