MD HB100 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law relating to the authority of a dental hygienist to practice dental hygiene under general supervision in a long-term care facility.
Title
Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-0) (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-0) (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 381 |
2014-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-0) |
2014-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-10-22 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Assisted Living
Contracts
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Long-Term Care
Nursing Homes
Sunset
Contracts
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Long-Term Care
Nursing Homes
Sunset