MD HB100 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 423
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 423
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making the proposed appropriations contained in the State budget for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2014, in accordance with Article III, Section 52 of the Maryland Constitution; etc.
Title
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2014)
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-8) (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-36) (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Kasemeyer) Adopted (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {923922/1 Adopted (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {393820/1 Rejected (16-31) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {163429/1 Rejected (14-33) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {923320/1 Rejected (11-32) (Y: 11 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {153820/1 Rejected (11-36) (Y: 11 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {223426/1 Rejected (9-38) (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-36) (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Schulz) Rejected (43-89) (Y: 43 N: 89 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) Rejected (44-93) (Y: 44 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (103-36) (Y: 103 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-5) (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Kasemeyer) Adopted (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Brinkley) {923922/1 Adopted (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {393820/1 Rejected (16-31) (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {163429/1 Rejected (14-33) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {923320/1 Rejected (11-32) (Y: 11 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Pipkin) {153820/1 Rejected (11-36) (Y: 11 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {223426/1 Rejected (9-38) (Y: 9 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-36) (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Schulz) Rejected (43-89) (Y: 43 N: 89 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Krebs) Rejected (44-93) (Y: 44 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 423 |
2013-05-02 | House | Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution |
2013-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-8) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-36) |
2013-04-05 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | House | Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Conway) Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | (Senators Jones-Rodwell, McFadden and King) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate advisors: |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senators Kasemeyer, Madaleno, DeGrange, Robey, and Brinkley |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2013-03-22 | House | (Delegates Proctor, DeBoy and James) |
2013-03-22 | House | House advisors: |
2013-03-22 | House | Delegates Conway, Bohanan, Gaines, Jones, and Beitzel |
2013-03-22 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-03-22 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Getty) {253327/1 Withdrawn |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted (47-0) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {923922/1 Adopted (47-0) (#46) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {393820/1 Rejected (16-31) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {163429/1 Rejected (14-33) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {923320/1 Rejected (11-32) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {153820/1 Rejected (11-36) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {223426/1 Rejected (9-38) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#40-45) Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#27-39) Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#20-26) Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#10-19) Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#1-9) Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-36) |
2013-03-15 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Glass) {703926/1 Rejected |
2013-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) Rejected (43-89) |
2013-03-13 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Cane) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) {213926/1 |
2013-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Conway) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Conway) {753825/1 |
2013-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (44-93) |
2013-03-13 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Krebs) {713320/1 |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#122-146) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#112-121) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#102-111) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#84-101) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#71-83) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#57-70) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#36-56) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#32-35) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#31) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#28-30) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#27) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#25-26) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#25-35) |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#14-24) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Amendment (#1-13) Adopted |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2013-03-11 | House | Special Order until 3/13 (Delegate Conway) Adopted |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments |
2013-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2013-01-16 | House | First Reading Appropriations |