MA S1662 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to restoration to service for certain retirees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to restoration to service

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-30SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2021-09-13JointHearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S2462 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3864 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3765 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S44 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3911 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence
H3941 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4093 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - House concurred
S1770 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H3429 (Similar To) 2021-11-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4263
H3254 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1609 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - House concurred
S2411 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1719 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Accompanied H2732
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4338 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback