MA S1505 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2692

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to conduct a public health study of synthetic drugs in the commonwealth. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To conduct a public health study of synthetic drugs in the commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-14SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2692
2021-10-27JointHearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H2220 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S787 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
H2490 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1025 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1702
S1001 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1448 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback