MA S945 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2976
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow restitution for civil rights violations. The Judiciary.
Title
To allow restitution for civil rights violations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2976 |
2022-06-30 | House | House concurred |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-14 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H3077 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1871 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S946 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S3063
H1479 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5173
S2976 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1684 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1871 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S946 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S3063
H1479 (Similar To) 2022-10-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5173
S2976 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1684 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S945 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S945.pdf |