MA S937 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to treatment, not imprisonment. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to treatment, not imprisonment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-10SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H730 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H222 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1743 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
H907 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
H2763 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1145 (Similar To) 2019-03-27 - Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1719 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
H2194 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S563 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback