MA S913 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote homelessness prevention in Massachusetts. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure right to counsel in eviction proceedings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-10SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-08JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S344 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H1533 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2043 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1358 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Senate concurred
S501 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S2165 (Similar To) 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1633 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S313 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - House concurred
H3302 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1525 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S1326 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - House concurred
H1498 (Similar To) 2019-09-17 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1234 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback