MA S902 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2953
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to access to justice. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to access to justice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2953 |
2020-10-26 | House | House concurred |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Thursday November 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-05-21 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday July 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S978 (Similar To) 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
S1398 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1401 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3409 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S914 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S924 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S886 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1419 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1510 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2953 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1398 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1401 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3409 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S914 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S924 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S886 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1419 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1510 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2953 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S902 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S902.pdf |