MA S90 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation protecting youth during custodial interrogations. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Protecting youth during custodial interrogations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-08-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S37 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2021
H1645 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5170
H1920 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2530 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1949 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1233
H1739 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
S1459 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S912 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S923 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2943
S1437 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2892
H1645 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5170
H1920 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2530 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2713
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1949 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1233
H1739 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
S1459 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S912 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1233 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S923 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2943
S1437 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2892
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S90 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S90.pdf |