MA S896 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase access to affordable housing. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To increase access to affordable housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-18SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2023-06-21JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H4827 (Similar To) 2024-07-22 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4880 (Similar To) 2024-07-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2874 (Similar To) 2024-07-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/24/2024 from 01:30 PM-01:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback