MA S887 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a task force to study racial disparities in home ownership and reducing the wealth gap. Housing.
Title
Resolve establishing a task force to study racial disparities in home ownership and reducing the wealth gap
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-11 | Senate | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2021-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H101 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
S2350 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S918 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
S2350 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2621
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S918 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S887 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S887.pdf |