MA S871 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the use of public funds to pay awards, fines or settlements in cases where public officials are found responsible or guilty of sexual harassment or assault. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting the use of public funds to pay awards, fines or settlements in cases where public officials are found responsible or guilty of sexual harassment or assault
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-09-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S714 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2924 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S939 (Similar To) 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
S901 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1910 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H3370 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2924 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S939 (Similar To) 2020-11-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2953
S901 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1910 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H3370 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S871 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S871.pdf |