MA S842 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2812
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the endowment match program. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to the endowment match program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2812 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2786 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1333 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
S2499 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H1357 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
H3693 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S841 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2744
S824 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S2812 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1333 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
S2499 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H1357 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
H3693 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S841 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2744
S824 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2812
S2812 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S842 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S842.pdf |