MA S825 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote public safety and better outcomes for young adults. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote public safety and better outcomes for young adults

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-10SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday May 12, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-10-15JointHearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H2957 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1513 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
S1464 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
S1378 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
S1439 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
S2137 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
S2013 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - House concurred
S2040 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S1383 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
S2301 (Similar To) 2019-08-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 60 of the Acts of 2019
S2379 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback