MA S824 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote housing opportunity and mobility through eviction sealing (HOMES). The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting housing opportunity and mobility through eviction sealing (HOMES)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S814 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S815 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S791 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
S1141 (Similar To) 2019-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2
S813 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S817 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S804 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1323 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1263 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-07-21 - Hearing scheduled for 07/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
S778 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
H187 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/25/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3979 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3998 (Similar To) 2019-11-13 - Enacted

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback