MA S811 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Accompanied H1301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-06 - Accompanied H1301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to consistent treatment of life estates. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to consistent treatment of life estates
Sponsors
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | House | Accompanied H1301 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-03-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1301 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2505 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4060 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2580 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H915 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4250
H1460 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1305 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
H2098 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
H1508 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S724 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S193 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2569
S877 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4250 (Similar To) 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2022
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4979 (Similar To) 2022-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2022
S3097 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022
H846 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5236
H3637 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2505 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4060 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2580 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H915 (Similar To) 2021-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4250
H1460 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S1305 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2919
H2098 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5194
H1508 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S724 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
S1802 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1304 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1288 (Similar To) 2021-11-09 - Accompanying S1276
S1284 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S193 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2569
S877 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4250 (Similar To) 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2022
S2584 (Similar To) 2022-08-01 - Reported by S3097
H4979 (Similar To) 2022-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2022
S3097 (Similar To) 2022-08-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 177 of the Acts of 2022
H846 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5236
H3637 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S811 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S811.pdf |