MA S794 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H319
Note: Replaces legislation H1319
Note: Replaces legislation H1319
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to Medicare savings programs eligibility. Health Care Financing.
Title
Regarding Medicare savings programs eligibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Accompanied by H1319 |
2021-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S766 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H319 (Replaces) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H1319 (Replaces) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied S794
H179 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4547
S116 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H752 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Accompanied S405
H319 (Replaces) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
H1319 (Replaces) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied S794
H179 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4547
S116 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H752 (Similar To) 2021-12-20 - Accompanied S405
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S794 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S794.pdf |