MA S793 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied H1318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied H1318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to update Medicaid resource limits for seniors. Health Care Financing.
Title
To update Medicaid resource limits for seniors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Accompanied H1318 |
2021-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1318 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S767 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1290 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5229
S1375 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S767 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1290 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5229
S1375 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H2319
S805 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S793 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S793.pdf |