MA S772 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2800
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide MassHealth benefits to emergency services personnel. Health Care Financing.
Title
Providing MassHealth benefits to emergency services personnel
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2800 |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S401 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S741 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Placed on file
S2800 (Replaced by) 2022-04-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H722 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H2023 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S355 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S1573 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S2089 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S401 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S709 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2928
S1 (Similar To) 2021-01-28 - Placed on file
S1930 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1289 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
S741 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Placed on file
S2800 (Replaced by) 2022-04-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H722 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S765 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S772 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S772.pdf |