MA S763 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote an enhanced care worker minimum wage. Health Care Financing.
Title
To promote an enhanced care worker minimum wage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1155 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
H1231 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4254 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H1231 (Similar To) 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H4254 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2024 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S763 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S763.pdf |