MA S744 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to guarantee debt-free public higher education. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To guarantee debt-free public higher education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-04-11JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S2151 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - House concurred
H1230 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H481 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S770 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S751 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H2234 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H1221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback