MA S741 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to commit to higher education the resources to Insure a strong and healthy public higher education system. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Committing to higher education the resources to Insure a strong and healthy public higher education system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-23SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-18HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-04-11JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H476 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S1992 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H481 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
H1208 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H8 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S755 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H254 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S768 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1471 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S750 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H1227 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H1188 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1247 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence
H1218 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
S1699 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S739 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H4177 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback