MA S716 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-12 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to remove the restrictions on the licenses of certified registered nurse anesthetists as recommended by the Institute of Medicine and the Federal Trade Commission. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To remove the restrictions on the licenses of certified registered nurse anesthetists as recommended by the Institute of Medicine and the Federal Trade Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-12HouseHouse concurred
2019-08-08SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-04-08HouseHouse concurred
2019-04-04SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H1868 (Similar To) 2019-08-15 - Senate concurred
S386 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S517 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2013 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S623 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2238 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Reported (in part) by S2308
S2321 (Similar To) 2019-08-19 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback