MA S706 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to ensure prescription drug cost transparency and affordability. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure prescription drug cost transparency and affordability

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-03-27JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H898 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1972 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1860 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S303 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S721 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S552 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H3489 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback