MA S678 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve public health through a common application for core food, health and safety-net programs. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving public health through a common application for core food, health and safety-net programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H193 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1841 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1141 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2241 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1848 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S492 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S962 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1289 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S1617 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback