MA S673 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect Massachusetts hospitals and health systems. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Massachusetts hospitals and health systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-04-24JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S520 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H849 (Similar To) 2019-07-22 - Accompanied S449
S1340 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H332 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S968 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S495 (Similar To) 2019-10-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2388
H1927 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S893 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3974 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
S2294 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2313 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2338 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #94 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0]
S2341 (Similar To) 2020-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2388 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback